Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/28/2013