Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/05/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/09/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/02/2013