Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/27/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/31/2013