Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/04/2014