Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/03/2014