Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 05/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/30/2013