Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/21/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 05/21/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 05/21/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/23/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/26/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/02/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/02/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/13/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/27/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/18/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/10/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2014