Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/04/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/15/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/26/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/05/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/20/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/09/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/18/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/22/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/27/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/24/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 11/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/14/2014