Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/22/2013