There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Partnership to Build America Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the American Infrastructure Fund, to provide bond guarantees and make loans to States, local governments, and non-profit infrastructure providers for investments in certain infrastructure projects, and to provide equity investments in such projects, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
09/04/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/04/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/04/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/22/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/22/2013 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2013 Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2013 Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/10/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/13/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/03/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/30/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/11/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/13/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/23/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/23/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/22/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation05/22/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit09/04/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials09/04/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment09/04/2013 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/22/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (12)

  • Corporate finance and management
  • Foreign and international corporations
  • Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
  • Government lending and loan guarantees
  • Income tax exclusion
  • Infrastructure development
  • Interest, dividends, interest rates
  • Public-private cooperation
  • Securities
  • State and local finance
  • Taxation of foreign income

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2084. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2013)

Partnership to Build America Act of 2013 - Establishes the American Infrastructure Fund (AIF) as a wholly-owned government corporation to provide bond guarantees and make loans to state and local governments and non-profit infrastructure providers for transportation, energy, water, communications, or educational facility infrastructure projects (Qualified Infrastructure Projects [QIPs]). Requires AIF also to make equity investments in QIPs such entities sponsor.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, acting through the AIF, to issue American Infrastructure Bonds with an aggregate face value of $50 billion. Requires proceeds from the sale of the bonds to be deposited into the AIF.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow U.S. corporations to exclude from gross income qualified cash dividend amounts received during a taxable year from a foreign-controlled corporation equal to the face value of qualified infrastructure bonds the corporation has purchased.

Prohibits allowance of a foreign tax credit to the excluded portion of any dividend received by a U.S. corporation. Prohibits also the allowance of a deduction for expenses related to that excludable portion.