Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/27/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/22/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/10/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/30/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/13/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/23/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2014