Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/13/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/03/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/11/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/23/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/29/2014