There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Taxpayer Dollars and Identity under Obamacare Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit Federal funds for the establishment or operation of patient navigator programs under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/24/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/22/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/02/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/22/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/24/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2087.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2087. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2013)

Protecting Taxpayer Dollars and Identity under Obamacare Act - Prohibits the use of authorized or appropriated federal funds for the establishment or operation of: (1) a navigator program under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA); or (2) a non-navigator program that provides any of the types of assistance provided under a navigator program, regardless of whether the non-navigator program is established in connection with a state or federally operated exchange.