There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

School Access to Emergency Epinephrine Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

School Access to Emergency Epinephrine Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

School Access to Emergency Epinephrine Act

Short Titles as Introduced

School Access to Emergency Epinephrine Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

School Access to Emergency Epinephrine Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

School Access to Emergency Epinephrine Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to increase the preference given, in awarding certain asthma-related grants, to certain States (those allowing trained school personnel to administer epinephrine and meeting other related requirements).


Actions Overview (8)

Date
11/13/2013Became Public Law No: 113-48. (TXT | PDF)
11/13/2013Signed by President.
11/06/2013Presented to President.
10/31/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7778)
10/30/2013Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
07/30/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5145-5146)
07/30/2013Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-182.
05/22/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
11/13/2013Became Public Law No: 113-48. (TXT | PDF)
11/13/2013Signed by President.
11/06/2013HousePresented to President.
11/01/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/31/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7778)
10/30/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 229.
10/30/2013SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
10/30/2013SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/31/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
07/30/2013-8:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/30/2013-8:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5145-5146)
07/30/2013-7:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2094.
07/30/2013-7:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5145-5147)
07/30/2013-7:57pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/30/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130.
07/30/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-182.
07/17/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/17/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/16/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/24/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/22/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/22/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/25/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/26/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/26/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/22/2013 Referred to
07/17/2013 Markup by
07/30/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-182
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/24/2013 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/31/2013 Referred to
10/30/2013 Markup by
10/30/2013 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2094. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-48 (11/13/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

School Access to Emergency Epinephrine Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act, with respect to asthma-related grants for child health services, to give an additional preference to a state that allows self-administration of asthma and anaphylaxis medication and makes a certification concerning the adequacy of the state's civil liability protection law to protect trained school personnel who may administer epinephrine to a student reasonably believed to be having an anaphylactic reaction.

Requires elementary and secondary schools in such a state to: (1) permit trained personnel to administer epinephrine to a student reasonably believed to be having such a reaction, (2) maintain a supply of epinephrine in a secure location that is easily accessible to trained personnel for such treatment, and (3) have in place a plan for having on the school premises during operating hours one or more designated personnel trained in administration of epinephrine.