Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/23/2013