Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/25/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/26/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/26/2013