Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/24/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 08/01/2014