There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 787 State Route 17M in Monroe, New York, as the "National Clandestine Service of the Central Intelligence Agency NCS Officer Gregg David Wenzel Memorial Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-209. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014Presented to President.
12/08/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/08/2014Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6395-6396)
06/17/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5377)
05/22/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-209. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014HousePresented to President.
12/09/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/08/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/08/2014SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6395-6396)
06/18/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/17/2014-2:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/17/2014-2:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5377)
06/17/2014-2:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2112.
06/17/2014-2:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5376-5377)
06/17/2014-2:49pmHouseMr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/21/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/21/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/22/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/22/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform05/22/2013 Referred to
05/21/2014 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/18/2014 Referred to
12/08/2014 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2112. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-209 (12/16/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 787 State Route 17M in Monroe, New York, as the "National Clandestine Service of the Central Intelligence Agency NCS Officer Gregg David Wenzel Memorial Post Office."