Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/16/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/17/2014