Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2014