Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/16/2013