Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/13/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/07/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/11/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/12/2014