Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/05/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/10/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/12/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 10/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/30/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew