Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/04/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/04/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/18/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/24/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/24/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/19/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/20/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/27/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/08/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/29/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/08/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/27/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/11/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/20/2014