Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/17/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/01/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/22/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/17/2014