Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/17/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/27/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/04/2014