Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/09/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/23/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 12/04/2014