Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2014