Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/17/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/23/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/26/2014