Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/11/2014