Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/22/2013