Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/26/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/10/2014