There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FIT Kids Act
Fitness Integrated with Teaching Kids Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize a grant program to promote physical education, activity, and fitness and nutrition, and to ensure healthy students, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/23/2013Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/10/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/08/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/23/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education07/08/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training07/08/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2178. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2013)

Fitness Integrated with Teaching Kids Act or FIT Kids Act - Requires the Secretary of Education to award grants to states to implement comprehensive programs to promote physical activity, education, and fitness and nutrition that are based on scientifically valid research, and an analysis of need that considers, at a minimum, physical education indicators. Limits a grant award to a maximum of five years.

Prescribes certain activities under a grant, including that states must: (1) develop and implement a physical education indicators measurement system; (2) collect and publish information on physical activity, education, and fitness and nutrition at the school level; (3) use indicators to identify and address student needs; (4) encourage local education agencies to integrate physical activity, education, and fitness into a range of subjects throughout the school day and locations within schools; and (5) award sub-grants based on identified needs. Requires the Secretary, acting through the Director of the Institute of Education Sciences, to establish program performance metrics to measure the effectiveness of the grant program's activities.

Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to require the compact with parents under the school-level parental involvement policy to include a description of the school's responsibility to support their children in leading a healthy and active life, such as by providing health meals and snacks, encouraging participation in physical education, and sharing in physical activity outside the school day to support successful academic achievement.

Amends the Rehabilitation Act of 1973 to require the Secretary to promote equal opportunities for students with disabilities to be included and participate in physical education and extracurricular athletics implemented in, or in conjunction with, elementary schools, secondary schools, and institutions of higher education, by ensuring the provision of appropriate technical assistance and guidance for schools and institutions and their personnel.