Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/10/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/30/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/08/2014