Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/29/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2014