There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Half in Ten Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Federal Interagency Working Group on Reducing Poverty which will create and carry out a national plan to cut poverty in America in half in ten years.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/23/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/23/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/26/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/23/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.2182.

Subjects (16)

  • Advisory bodies
  • Child safety and welfare
  • Climate change and greenhouse gases
  • Community life and organization
  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Disaster relief and insurance
  • Economic performance and conditions
  • Employment and training programs
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Federal officials
  • Government information and archives
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Performance measurement
  • Poverty and welfare assistance
  • Public-private cooperation

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2182. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2013)

Half in Ten Act of 2013 - Establishes within the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) a Federal Interagency Working Group on Reducing Poverty, which shall develop a National Strategy to reduce the number of persons living in poverty in America in half within 10 years after release of the 2012 Census report on Income, Poverty and Health Insurance Coverage in the United States: 2011.