Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/26/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/04/2013