Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/28/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/10/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/10/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/26/2013