Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/09/2014