Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/14/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/15/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/29/2014