There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Flood Insurance Implementation Reform Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To delay the implementation of certain provisions of the Biggert-Waters Flood Insurance Reform Act of 2012, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/23/2013Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/16/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/08/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/23/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2199.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2199. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2013)

Flood Insurance Implementation Reform Act of 2013 - Delays until three years after enactment of this Act the requirement of the Biggert-Waters Flood Insurance Reform Act of 2012 (Biggert-Waters) that any property located in an area participating in the national flood insurance program have the risk premium rate charged for flood insurance on the property adjusted to accurately reflect its current risk of flood.

Amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to delay until five years after enactment of Biggert-Waters the prohibition against provision to prospective insureds of flood insurance by the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) at (subsidy) rates less than full actuarial estimates for property purchased after enactment of Biggert-Waters.

Prohibits FEMA, when determining whether a community has made adequate progress on flood protection improvement systems, from counting federal funding or participation in such efforts.

Makes flood insurance available at certain special flood hazard area rates to riverine and coastal levees located in a community which FEMA has determined to be in the process of restoring a flood protection system previously accredited on a Flood Insurance Rate Map as providing 100-year frequency flood protection but which no longer does so. Requires such rates to apply without regard to the level of federal funding or participation.

Amends Biggert-Waters to authorize FEMA to to use other funds in addition to those specified in that Act to carry out a specified affordability study. Requires FEMA, upon notice to certain congressional committees that it cannot submit the report on that study by the current deadline, to specify in such notice an alternative method of gathering the requisite information and subsequently to submit the information so gathered.

Directs FEMA to: (1) identify, review, update, maintain and publish National Flood Insurance rate maps pertaining to areas protected by non-structural flood mitigation features; and (2) work with states, local communities, and property owners to identify such areas and features.