Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/08/2014