Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/23/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/02/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/17/2013