Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/08/2014