Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/23/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 05/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/18/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/27/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/08/2013