Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/24/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/01/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 10/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/11/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 10/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/24/2014