Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/09/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/17/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/30/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/30/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/30/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/02/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/02/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/18/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/03/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/24/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/29/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/12/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/18/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/08/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/08/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/11/2014