There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Safeguarding Social Security Numbers Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Commissioner of Social Security to issue uniform standards for the method for truncation of Social Security account numbers in order to protect such numbers from being used in the perpetration of fraud or identity theft and to provide for a prohibition on the display to the general public on the Internet of Social Security account numbers by State and local governments and private entities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/19/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/03/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/11/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/03/2013 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security06/19/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2229.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2229. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/03/2013)

Safeguarding Social Security Numbers Act of 2013 - Directs the Commissioner of Social Security to issue uniform standards for the method for: (1) truncation of Social Security account numbers in order to facilitate their protection from use in fraud or identity theft, and (2) encryption (or other method of securing) of those numbers transmitted by means of the Internet.

Applies such standards to the federal government whenever it: (1) displays a Social Security account number; and (2) transfers, records, or otherwise utilizes such a number.

Prohibits a state, a local government, or any of their officers, employees, or contractors from displaying to the general public on the Internet all or any portion of any Social Security account number, except in compliance with such truncation and encryption standards or if the number belongs to a deceased individual. Prescribes a civil monetary penalty of up to $5,000 per day for violation of this prohibition.

Directs the Attorney General to award grants to state and local governments to carry out activities to remove, redact, or truncate, in accordance with the uniform standards, all Social Security account numbers on forms and records of their executive, legislative, and judicial agencies that would be displayed to the general public on the Internet in violation of this Act.