Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/11/2014