Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/21/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/03/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/26/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/10/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/12/2014